EP4049741 - CLEANING DEVICE FOR AN INDUSTRIAL DUST FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green Process Engineering GmbH Lise-Meitner-Str. 2 24941 Flensburg / DE | [2023/42] |
Former [2022/35] | For all designated states SiccaDania GmbH Raiffeisenstrasse 13 24941 Flensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schenk, Lothar 45525 Hattingen / DE | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Janke Scholl Patentanwälte PartG mbB Homberger Straße 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 22156051.9 | 10.02.2022 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | DE202110104429 | 24.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021104429 | [2022/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049741 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4049741 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/04, B01D46/24, B01D46/71 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
B01D46/71 (EP);
B01D46/04 (EP);
B01D46/2403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN INDUSTRIELLES STAUBFILTER | [2022/35] | English: | CLEANING DEVICE FOR AN INDUSTRIAL DUST FILTER | [2022/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE POUR UN FILTRE À POUSSIÈRES INDUSTRIEL | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 16.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/45] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 18.10.2023 | |
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 18.10.2023 | |
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4302228 (RITTER KENT E) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [XI]US5180110 (BRAME WARREN L [AU]) [X] 1-3,14 * figures 1,2 * * column 2, lines 1-41 * [I] 4; | [A]AU2006200263 (MIKROPUL AUSTRALIA PTY LTD) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [XI]DE102008048589 (MIKROPUL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] * [I] 4 | by applicant | DE3618020 | US6022388 | DE10320486 |