EP4050376 - RADAR PROXIMITY IMAGING SYSTEM WITH MULTI-CHANNEL ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES 4 rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2024/05] |
Former [2022/35] | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles - Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEYRAC, Yoan 33701 MERIGNAC CEDEX / FR | 02 /
COTTRON, Rodolphe 33701 MERIGNAC CEDEX / FR | 03 /
KEMKEMIAN, Stéphane 33701 MERIGNAC CEDEX / FR | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/10] | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2022/35] | Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 22156161.6 | 10.02.2022 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | FR20210001811 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: FR 2101811 | [2022/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4050376 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4050376 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/935, G01S13/42, G01S13/34, // G01S13/02 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
G01S13/935 (EP);
G01S13/34 (EP);
G01S13/42 (EP);
G01S2013/0245 (EP);
Y02A90/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RADARSYSTEM ZUR NAHBEREICHSBILDGEBUNG MIT MEHRWEGANTENNE | [2022/35] | English: | RADAR PROXIMITY IMAGING SYSTEM WITH MULTI-CHANNEL ANTENNA | [2022/35] | French: | SYSTEME RADAR D'IMAGERIE DE PROXIMITE A ANTENNE MULTIVOIES | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 10.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 06.03.2024 | ES | 06.03.2024 | FI | 06.03.2024 | HR | 06.03.2024 | LT | 06.03.2024 | LV | 06.03.2024 | NL | 06.03.2024 | SE | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.06.2024 | RS | 06.06.2024 | GR | 07.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
SE | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
LV | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 06.03.2024 | |
ES | 06.03.2024 | ||
FI | 06.03.2024 | ||
HR | 06.03.2024 | ||
LT | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.06.2024 | ||
RS | 06.06.2024 | ||
GR | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 06.03.2024 | |
NO | 06.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018115372 (IEE SA [LU]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] *; | [Y]EP3611538 (NXP BV [NL]) [Y] 5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0025] *; | [XAYI]EP3671270 (THALES SA [FR]) [X] 1,6,7,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0035] - [0036] - [0043] , [0118] * [A] 2-4 [Y] 5 [I] 5,8,9; | [A] - FEIL PETER ET AL, "Multi function radar system for improved situational awareness in helicopters", 2013 EUROPEAN RADAR CONFERENCE, EMA, (20131009), pages 153 - 155, XP032533679 [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | - "MIMO Radar Processing Methods for Anticipating and Preventing Real World Imperfections", MATHIEU CATTENOZ, Signal and Image Processing, Université Paris Sud - Paris, (20150000), vol. XI |