EP4056933 - GUIDE FEATURE FOR A REFRIGERATION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2023/11] |
Former [2022/37] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chhajed, Rahul Subhash 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 02 /
Navalgund, Manjunathraddi 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 03 /
Katkar, Mansi 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 04 /
Sarma, Abinash 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | Spina, Alessandro Whirlpool Management EMEA S.R.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 22156201.0 | 10.02.2022 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | US202117196284 | 09.03.2021 Original published format: US202117196284 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056933 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F25D21/14 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
F25D21/14 (EP,CN,US);
F25D11/022 (CN);
F25D23/006 (US);
F25D2321/143 (EP);
F25D2321/144 (CN);
F25D2321/1442 (EP);
F25D2321/146 (EP,CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSELEMENT FÜR EINE KÜHLEINHEIT | [2022/37] | English: | GUIDE FEATURE FOR A REFRIGERATION UNIT | [2022/37] | French: | FONCTIONNALITÉ DE GUIDAGE POUR UNE UNITÉ DE RÉFRIGÉRATION | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 03.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2678623 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-10 * abstract * [I] 5-7,11-15; | [X]WO2014124839 (BSH BOSCH & SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4* abstract * |