EP4043168 - AN OPERATING ASSEMBLY FOR EDGE BANDING MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/33] | OPERATOR GROUP FOR WOOD PANEL EDGEBANDING MACHINES OR THE LIKE | ||
[2024/40] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIESSE S.p.A. Via della Meccanica, 16 61122 Pesaro (PU) / IT | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGOSTINI, Federico 61122 PESARO (PU) / IT | 02 /
PAZZAGLIA, Marco 61122 PESARO (PU) / IT | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 22156424.8 | 11.02.2022 | [2022/33] | Priority number, date | IT20210003059 | 11.02.2021 Original published format: IT202100003059 | [2022/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4043168 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B27D5/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
B27D5/003 (EP);
B27D5/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINE BEDIENUNGSEINHEIT FÜR KANTENANLEIMMASCHINEN | [2024/40] | English: | AN OPERATING ASSEMBLY FOR EDGE BANDING MACHINES | [2024/40] | French: | UN ENSEMBLE DE FONCTIONNEMENT POUR LES PLAQUEUSES DE CHANTS | [2024/40] |
Former [2022/33] | BEDIENEINHEIT FÜR HOLZKANTENANLEIMMASCHINEN ODER ÄHNLICHES | ||
Former [2022/33] | OPERATOR GROUP FOR WOOD PANEL EDGEBANDING MACHINES OR THE LIKE | ||
Former [2022/33] | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE POUR LES MACHINES À PLAQUER LES CHANTS EN BOIS OU SIMILAIRES | Examination procedure | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 25.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE9306484U (BRANDT HEINRICH MASCH [DE]); | [XA]WO0214004 (HOMAG HOLZBEARBEITUNGSSYSTEME [DE], et al); | [A]DE10234618 (BIESSE SPA [IT]); | [XAI]DE10229775 (GROTEFELD MASCHB & VERTRIEBS G [DE]); | [XAI]IT201800005935 |