EP4024921 - SECURING OF THE CHOICE OF THE ROAMING NETWORK VISITED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 111, Quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | For all designated states Orange 111, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNET, Cédric 92326 CHÂTILLON CEDEX / FR | 02 /
EL MOUMOUHI, Sanaa 92326 CHÂTILLON CEDEX / FR | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 22156962.7 | 20.04.2018 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | FR20170053798 | 28.04.2017 Original published format: FR 1753798 | [2022/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024921 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4024921 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/02, H04W48/08, // H04W48/18, H04W60/04, H04W76/18 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04W48/08 (EP,CN);
H04W48/02 (CN,US);
H04W48/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04W60/04 (EP,CN);
H04W76/18 (EP,CN);
H04W8/02 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SICHERUNG DER AUSWAHL DES BEIM ROAMING BESUCHTEN NETZES | [2022/27] | English: | SECURING OF THE CHOICE OF THE ROAMING NETWORK VISITED | [2022/27] | French: | SÉCURISATION DU CHOIX DU RÉSEAU VISITÉ EN ITINÉRANCE | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 10.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18725275.4 / EP3526993 | EP19215961.4 / EP3641361 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.12.2022 | AT | 21.12.2022 | DK | 21.12.2022 | EE | 21.12.2022 | FI | 21.12.2022 | HR | 21.12.2022 | LT | 21.12.2022 | LV | 21.12.2022 | RS | 21.12.2022 | SI | 21.12.2022 | SK | 21.12.2022 | SM | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.03.2023 | IS | 21.04.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/46] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 21.12.2022 | |
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 21.12.2022 | |
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 21.12.2022 | |
NO | 21.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007281694 (LIN YUHUI J [US], et al); | [A]US2015256993 (BELLAMKONDA KRISHNA K [US], et al) |