EP4023304 - A KERATOTIC PLUG-REMOVING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozawa, Toshiaki Tokyo, 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Takaya Wakayama-shi, Wakayama, 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
Miyoshi, Mariko Wakayama-shi, Wakayama, 640-8580 / JP | 04 /
Furukawa, Daisuke Wakayama-shi, Wakayama, 640-8580 / JP | 05 /
Shirai, Aya Haga-gun, Tochigi, 321-3497 / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 22157024.5 | 09.04.2018 | [2022/27] | Priority number, date | WO2017JP14730 | 10.04.2017 Original published format: PCT/JP2017/014730 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023304 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/10, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/39, A61K8/44, A61K8/60, A61K8/86 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/39 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (US);
A61K8/466 (US);
A61K8/604 (EP);
A61K8/86 (EP);
A61K2800/596 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON KERATOTISCHEN PFROPFEN | [2022/27] | English: | A KERATOTIC PLUG-REMOVING COMPOSITION | [2022/27] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR L'ÉLIMINATION DE BOUCHONS KÉRATOSIQUES | [2022/27] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 14.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18784345.3 / EP3610852 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2004075575 (NARIS COSMETICS CO LTD) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 6] , [00 8] * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 12] * * paragraph [0014] *; | [XYI]US2004266656 (SAKURAI NAOE [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-11,13 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 4] , [00 6] * * paragraphs [0009] , [0 11] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0050] * * Comparative example 4;; example 4; table 1 * * example 9 * [Y] 1-13 [I] 4,5; | [XI]JP3970861B (KAO CORP) [X] 1-3,6-11,13 * paragraph [0037]; example 8 * [I] 4,5; | [A]EP2438902 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2821053 (KAO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 51] * * example 36; table 14 *; | [E]EP3610849 (KAO CORP [JP]) [E] 1-13 * examples XY-1, XY-6; table 6 * * examples XY-10, XY-14 to XY-21; table 7 * * examples XYA1 to XYA-15; table 17 * * examples XYB-1 to XYB-6; table 18 * * examples XYB-1, XYB-7; table 19 * * paragraphs [0173] , [ 176] , [ 177] , [ 178] * | by applicant | JPH1112127 | JP2004075575 | JP2007230929 | JP2011012252 | JP2015028123 | JP2015113307 |