EP4230114 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING DROWSINESS AND/OR SLEEP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIWALE, Sujitkumar Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHAKRABARTI, Biswaroop Eindhoven / NL | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 22157370.2 | 17.02.2022 | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4230114 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
A61B5/6817 (EP);
A61B5/4809 (EP);
A61B5/12 (EP);
A61B5/486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG VON SCHLÄFRIGKEIT UND/ODER SCHLAF | [2023/34] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING DROWSINESS AND/OR SLEEP | [2023/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE SOMNOLENCE ET/OU DE SOMMEIL | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/30] | 19.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018242908 (SAZONOV EDWARD [US], et al); | [A]EP3936046 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]); | by applicant | WO2012058886 | CN109561219 |