EP4047299 - CONTROL ELEMENT, BOLT CATCH LEVER, BOLT CARRIER, TRIGGER, TRIGGER ASSEMBLY FOR A MACHINE GUN AND MACHINE GUN EQUIPPED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heckler & Koch GmbH Heckler & Koch Strasse 1 78727 Oberndorf/Neckar / DE | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIMM, Stefan 78739 Hardt / DE | 02 /
HETZEL, Markus 78736 Epfendorf-Talhausen / DE | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 22157378.5 | 18.02.2022 | [2022/34] | Priority number, date | DE202110103878 | 18.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021103878 | [2022/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4047299 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4047299 | Date: | 07.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F41A19/12, F41A19/33, F41A19/46, F41A19/10, // F41A9/29 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
F41A19/33 (EP,KR);
F41A19/10 (EP,KR,US);
F41A17/42 (US);
F41A17/58 (US);
F41A19/12 (EP);
F41A19/27 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | F41A19/12, F41A19/33, F41A19/46, // F41A9/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] |
Former [2022/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERELEMENT, VERSCHLUSSFANGHEBEL, VERSCHLUSSTRÄGER, ABZUG, ABZUGSBAUGRUPPE FÜR EINE MASCHINENWAFFE SOWIE DAMIT AUSGESTATTETE MASCHINENWAFFE | [2022/34] | English: | CONTROL ELEMENT, BOLT CATCH LEVER, BOLT CARRIER, TRIGGER, TRIGGER ASSEMBLY FOR A MACHINE GUN AND MACHINE GUN EQUIPPED THEREWITH | [2022/34] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE COMMANDE, ARRÊTOIR DE CULASSE, PORTE-CULASSE, GÂCHETTE, MODULE DE GÂCHETTE POUR UNE ARME AUTOMATIQUE, AINSI QU'ARME AUTOMATIQUE ÉQUIPÉE DE CEUX-CI | [2022/34] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 01.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2436175 (NEAL ERNEST C) [X] 10-12 * column 1, lines 1-3 * * column 6, lines 54-58 * * column 14, lines 26-53 * * column 15, lines 6-56 * * column 16, line 68 - column 17, line 2 * * figures 4a, 16, 17, 34, 35 * [Y] 14-16 [I] 13; | [A]US4448109 (JOHNSON JAMES H [US]) [A] 17,18,22 * column 5, lines 5-14 * * figure 4 *; | [XI]US4523510 (WILHELM GARY [US]) [X] 17,18,21,22 * column 1, lines 25-29 * * column 4, lines 36-44 * * figures 1, 3, 6, 9, 10 * [I] 19,20; | [Y]US2011168008 (LANDIES ROBERT I [US], et al) [Y] 16 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 27] * * figures 1-6 *; | [XDAYI]DE102012212388 (HECKLER & KOCH GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,17,18,22,23 * paragraphs [0031] , [0 35] , [0036] , [0039] - [0041] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 26-31 [Y] 14,15 [I] 2-9,19-21; | [X]US2015292828 (NEBEKER DARIN [US], et al) [X] 24 * paragraph [0036] * * figures 3, 7 *; | [XI]US2015330734 (KOLEV IVAN [US], et al) [X] 24 * paragraphs [79. 82] , [0 84] * * figures 25-27 * [I] 25; | [A]US2018066907 (HEFER BRANDON T [US], et al) [A] 2-9 * figures 3, 5, 6, 12-17 *; | [A]US2020386504 (TUBB GEORGE WYATT [US], et al) [A] 24* figures 2, 3 * | by applicant | DE102007004588 | EP2205925 | EP2198232 | US2011168008 | DE102012212388 | EP2205924 |