EP4020939 - EVALUATING IP LOCATION ON A CLIENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAPANESE, Antonio 8002 Zurich / CH | 02 /
GUPTA, Ankit 8002 Zurich / CH | 03 /
WALCZAK, Pawel 8002 Zurich / CH | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Harden, Henry Simon, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 22157627.5 | 06.11.2017 | [2022/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020939 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4020939 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/52, H04W64/00, // G01S5/02, G01S5/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP);
H04W64/003 (US);
G01S5/0244 (EP);
G01S5/0295 (EP);
G06F16/9537 (US);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04W4/023 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
H04W8/26 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] |
Former [2022/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSWERTUNG DES IP-STANDORTES AUF EINER CLIENT-VORRICHTUNG | [2022/26] | English: | EVALUATING IP LOCATION ON A CLIENT DEVICE | [2022/26] | French: | ÉVALUATION DE LOCALISATION IP SUR UN DISPOSITIF CLIENT | [2022/26] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 15.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17805340.1 / EP3586552 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010210240 (MAHAFFEY KEVIN [US], et al); | [YA]US2014171109 (SEGEV JONATHAN [IL]); | [XY]US2014235266 (EDGE STEPHEN WILLIAM [US], et al); | [YA]EP2988566 (WALKBASE OY [FI]); | [YA]WO2016032713 (APPLE INC [US]) |