EP4049796 - COUPLING KEY AND ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uhlig Präzisions Fertigungs GmbH Strasse der Befreiung 15 09423 Gelenau / DE | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uhlig, Roland 09423 Gelenau / DE | 02 /
Uhlig, Rico 09423 Gelenau / DE | 03 /
Uhlig, Tobias 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Rumrich, Gabriele Patentanwältin Limbacher Strasse 305 09116 Chemnitz / DE | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 22157803.2 | 21.02.2022 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | DE202110104262 | 23.02.2021 Original published format: DE102021104262 | DE202120100891U | 23.02.2021 Original published format: DE 202021100891 U | [2022/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049796 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25F1/00, A62C8/00, B25B13/00 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
B25F1/00 (EP);
B25B13/04 (EP);
B25B13/065 (EP);
B25B23/0007 (EP);
B25G1/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSSCHLÜSSEL UND ADAPTER | [2022/35] | English: | COUPLING KEY AND ADAPTER | [2022/35] | French: | CLÉ D'ACCOUPLEMENT ET ADAPTATEUR | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 22.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6899001 (SANDERS ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13,14 * column 1, line 10 - line 24 * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 44 * * figure - * [I] 12; | [XD]DE202005019741U (UHLIG PRAEZ S FERTIGUNGS GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]US2011192259 (STAUSS DAVE [US], et al) [X] 7-14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * figure - *; | [XA] - ANONYMOUS, DIN 14822-1:2016-03 Kupplungsschlüssel für Feuerwehrarmaturen - Teil 1: Kupplungsschlüssel BC, DIN NORM, DIN, DE, PAGE(S) 1 - 6, (20160301), XP009534444 [X] 1,4-6 * the whole document * [A] 7-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.31030/2408183 | by applicant | DE9213406U | DE9314270U |