EP4047871 - ADVANCED SECURITY CONTROL IMPLEMENTATION OF PROXIED CRYPTOGRAPHIC KEYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garantir LLC 321 10th Avenue, 1208 San Diego, CA 92101 / US | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Kieran San Diego, 92101 / US | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Dendorfer, Claus, et al Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Neuhauser Straße 47 80331 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 22157942.8 | 22.02.2022 | [2022/34] | Priority number, date | US202163152831P | 23.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163152831 P | US202117229426 | 13.04.2021 Original published format: US202117229426 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4047871 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04L9/32 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
H04L63/0884 (EP);
H04L63/0853 (EP);
H04L9/3234 (EP);
H04L9/3271 (EP);
H04L2209/76 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE SICHERHEITSTECHNISCHE PROXY-IMPLEMENTIERUNG FÜR KRYPTOGRAPHISCHE SCHLÜSSEL | [2022/34] | English: | ADVANCED SECURITY CONTROL IMPLEMENTATION OF PROXIED CRYPTOGRAPHIC KEYS | [2022/34] | French: | MISE EN UVRE D'UN CONTRÔLE DE SÉCURITÉ AVANCÉ DE CLÉS CRYPTOGRAPHIQUES MANDATÉES | [2022/34] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 24.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007289006 (RAMACHANDRAN VIYYOKARAN R [IN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] - [0063]; figures 2,3B * * paragraphs [0081] - [0108]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2014331297 (INNES ANDREW [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0106] - [0124]; figures 7,8 ** paragraphs [0125] - [0166]; figures 9A-9C *; | [I]US2017286696 (SHETTY SACHIN [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0077] - [0080]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0109] - [0126]; figures 5A-5C * * paragraphs [0173] - [0178] - [0186] , [0202]; figures 14,15 * |