EP4234365 - HYDRAULIC STEERING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss Power Solutions ApS Nordborgvej 81 6430 Nordborg / DK | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olsen, Palle 6430 Nordborg / DK | 02 /
Petersen, Morten Hoeck 6430 Nordborg / DK | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 22158175.4 | 23.02.2022 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4234365 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/09 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
B62D5/091 (EP);
B62D1/22 (EP);
B62D5/093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] |
Former [2023/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE LENKUNGSANORDNUNG | [2023/35] | English: | HYDRAULIC STEERING ARRANGEMENT | [2023/35] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DIRECTION HYDRAULIQUE | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 18.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPS6297878U (-) [X] 1,8 * figures 2,3 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 9; | [YD]US5285867 (PEDERSEN POUL H H [DK], et al) [YD] 1-15 * column 6, line 20 - line 42 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2007209356 (GRAEVE JOSHUA D [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [A]WO2015164321 (PARKER HANNIFIN CORP [US]) [A] 1,5 * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 24; figures 12,13 *; | [I]CN111942469 (JIANGSU XCMG ENGINEERING MACHINERY RES INSTITUTE CO LTD) [I] 1-3,6 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | EP3984860 [ ] (JIANGSU XCMG CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY RES INSTITUTE LTD [CN]) |