EP4054001 - ANTENNA MODULE AND ANTENNA DEVICE HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics AMP Korea Co., Ltd. 68 Gongdan 1-Ro 1Gil Jillyang-Eup Gyeongsan Kyongsangbuk-Do 712-837 / KR | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jung-Hoon 443-380 Suwon / KR | 02 /
Lee, Chang Hyun 443-380 Suwon / KR | 03 /
Park, Dong Wook 443-380 Suwon / KR | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Ashton, Gareth Mark Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/36] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | Application number, filing date | 22158333.9 | 23.02.2022 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | KR20210026237 | 26.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210026237 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4054001 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q5/335, H01Q5/371, H01Q9/42, H01Q9/04 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H01Q9/42 (EP);
H01Q9/0421 (EP,KR);
H01Q1/36 (CN);
H01Q9/0414 (US);
H01Q1/12 (CN);
H01Q1/38 (KR);
H01Q1/42 (US);
H01Q1/46 (KR);
H01Q1/48 (CN);
H01Q1/50 (CN);
H01Q5/335 (EP);
H01Q5/371 (EP);
H01Q9/30 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTENNENMODUL UND ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG, DIE DIESES AUFWEIST | [2022/36] | English: | ANTENNA MODULE AND ANTENNA DEVICE HAVING THE SAME | [2022/36] | French: | MODULE D'ANTENNE ET DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE LA COMPRENANT | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 02.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009278745 (HUANG LI-JU [TW]) [X] 1,2,12 * paragraph [0042]; figure 5 *; | [X]US2010127938 (ALI SHIROOK M [CA], et al) [X] 13,14 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028]; figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO2010068002 (EMW CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,13,15 * page 3 - page 4; figure 2 *; | [XY]US8179322 (NISSINEN PERTTI [FI]) [X] 1,13 * column 7 - column 11; figures 3,9,11 *[Y] 10,11; | [XYI]US2013063318 (YURUGI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,13,15-17,20 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045]; figure 1 * [Y] 10,11 [I] 18,19 |