EP4071447 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE CONDUCTIVITY OF A MEDIUM, METHOD OF OPERATING A MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOWMETER, AND MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOWMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krohne Messtechnik GmbH Ludwig-Krohne-Strasse 5 47058 Duisburg / DE | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brockhaus, Helmut 46145 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Dabrowski, Markus 47269 Duisburg / DE | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/41] | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 22158486.5 | 24.02.2022 | [2022/41] | Priority number, date | DE202110105516 | 08.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021105516 | [2022/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071447 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4071447 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/60, // G01R27/22 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
G01F1/60 (EP);
G01F1/58 (CN);
G01F1/584 (US);
G01F1/586 (US);
G01N27/02 (CN);
G01N27/08 (CN,US);
G01R27/22 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DER LEITFÄHIGKEIT EINES MEDIUMS, BETRIEBSVERFAHREN EINES MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVEN DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄTS, UND MAGNETISCH-INDUKTIVES DURCHFLUSSMESSGERÄT | [2022/41] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE CONDUCTIVITY OF A MEDIUM, METHOD OF OPERATING A MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOWMETER, AND MAGNETIC-INDUCTIVE FLOWMETER | [2022/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA CONDUCTIVITÉ D'UN MILIEU, PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DÉBITMÈTRE À INDUCTION MAGNÉTIQUE, ET DÉBITMÈTRE À INDUCTION MAGNÉTIQUE | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 09.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19844489 (CONDUCTA ENDRESS & HAUSER [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 1, lines 3-11 * * page 4, line 44 - page 5, line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE10243748 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0001] , [0 10] , [0 33] - [0057]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]DE102007014469 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 8] - [0015] - [0 34] - [0046]; figures 1, 5, 6 * |