EP4050777 - ELECTRIC MACHINE ASSEMBLY HAVING AN INTERNAL FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGAL BELOIT AMERICA, INC. 200 State Street Beloit, WI 53511 / US | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROSSON, Jeffrey, William Beloit, 53511 / US | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | South, Nicholas Geoffrey AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/35] | South, Nicholas Geoffrey AA Thornton IP LLP Octagon Point 5 Cheapside London EC2V 6AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 22158681.1 | 24.02.2022 | [2022/35] | Priority number, date | US202163153660P | 25.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163153660 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4050777 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4050777 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/04, H02K11/33, H02K9/06, H02K5/18, H02K9/14, // H02K9/08 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H02K5/18 (EP,US);
H02K5/225 (EP,US);
H02G11/00 (US);
H02K1/2773 (EP);
H02K1/30 (EP);
H02K11/33 (EP);
H02K15/02 (US);
H02K3/522 (US);
H02K5/10 (EP,US);
H02K5/15 (US);
H02K9/06 (US);
H02K9/08 (EP);
H02K9/14 (EP);
H02K9/227 (US);
H05K7/1491 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | H02K9/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINENANORDNUNG MIT INTERNEM GEBLÄSE | [2022/35] | English: | ELECTRIC MACHINE ASSEMBLY HAVING AN INTERNAL FAN | [2022/35] | French: | ENSEMBLE MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE DOTÉ D'UN VENTILATEUR INTERNE | [2022/35] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 03.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1722462 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 2,3,13 * paragraph [0041] ** figure 8 *; | [XAYI]DE102004031399 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,8,10-12,16-18,20 * paragraphs [0015] , [ 0016] * * paragraphs [0019] , [ 0020] * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 4-6,14,15 [Y] 2,3,13 [I] 9,19; | [X]US2015130386 (ZUMSTEIN JARED D [US], et al) [X] 1,11,12,20 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0102] * * figures 1, 6, 8, 12 * |