EP4234974 - A WEDGE CLAMP AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE WEDGE CLAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurolaite Oy Sinimäentie 6 A 3. krs 02630 Espoo / FI | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIIHONEN, Kalevi 71800 Siilinjärvi / FI | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Koivisto, Harri Kristian Koivisto Patentit Oy Pyhäjärvenkatu 5 B 406 33200 Tampere / FI | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 22159047.4 | 27.02.2022 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4234974 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/04 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
F16G11/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KEILKLEMME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER KEILKLEMME | [2023/35] | English: | A WEDGE CLAMP AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE WEDGE CLAMP | [2023/35] | French: | PRESSE DE SERRAGE À COINS ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/35] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]SE34348 (-) [X] 1-6,8-15 * figures 1-6 * [I] 7; | [A]JPS59126134 (MURAKI SABUROU, et al) [A] 1* figures 1-2 * |