EP4105893 - DYNAMIC ARTIFICAL INTELLIGENCE CAMERA MODEL UPDATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensormatic Electronics, LLC 6600 Congress Avenue Boca Raton, FL 33486 / US | [2022/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KULANDAI SAMY, Santle Camilus Boca Raton, 33487 / US | 02 /
PARK, Youngchoon Boca Raton, 33487 / US | [2022/51] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/51] | Application number, filing date | 22159166.2 | 28.02.2022 | [2022/51] | Priority number, date | US202117350830 | 17.06.2021 Original published format: US202117350830 | [2022/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4105893 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/774, G06V10/776, G06V10/778, G06V10/94 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G06V10/7747 (EP);
G06T7/13 (US);
G06T7/149 (US);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06V10/776 (EP);
G06V10/7788 (EP);
G06V10/7792 (EP);
G06V10/95 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06V10/255 (EP);
G06V10/82 (EP);
G06V20/52 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTUALISIERUNG EINES DYNAMISCHEN KAMERAMODELLS FÜR KÜNSTLICHE INTELLIGENZ | [2022/51] | English: | DYNAMIC ARTIFICAL INTELLIGENCE CAMERA MODEL UPDATE | [2022/51] | French: | MISE À JOUR DE MODÈLE DE CAMÉRA DYNAMIQUE D'INTELLIGENCE ARTIFICIELLE | [2022/51] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019138829 (GURGHIAN ALEXANDRU [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0020] - [0043] * * paragraph [0055] * * figures 1,3,4,6 *; | [A]US2019384291 (MICHALAKIS NIKOLAOS [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0021] - [0042] * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US2020401853 (XIONG SHAOMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 1-4 *; | [A] - MITTAL SPARSH ED - HSU CHING-HSIEN, "A Survey on optimized implementation of deep learning models on the NVIDIA Jetson platform", JOURNAL OF SYSTEMS ARCHITECTURE, (20190125), vol. 97, doi:10.1016/J.SYSARC.2019.01.011, ISSN 1383-7621, pages 428 - 442, XP085712272 [A] 1-20 * pages 433-436 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sysarc.2019.01.011 |