EP4080414 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING MANUFACTURING DEFECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QU, Shuhui Fremont, 94536 / US | 02 /
LEE, Janghwan Pleasanton, 94588 / US | 03 /
KANG, Yan Sunnyvale, 94065 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 22159396.5 | 01.03.2022 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | US202163179111P | 23.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163179111 P | US202117317806 | 11.05.2021 Original published format: US202117317806 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080414 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06N20/00, // G06N5/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G06N20/00 (EP);
G06N20/20 (KR);
G06N3/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,KR,US);
G06T7/0004 (KR);
G06V10/764 (KR);
G06N5/01 (EP);
G06T2207/20081 (KR);
G06T2207/20084 (KR);
G06T2207/30168 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON HERSTELLUNGSFEHLERN | [2022/43] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFYING MANUFACTURING DEFECTS | [2022/43] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER DES DÉFAUTS DE FABRICATION | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 01.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2020073737 (UNIV ZHEJIANG [CN]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]CN111044525 (GOERTEK INC) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0017]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0063] *; | [A]US2021102527 (LIU XIN [HK], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [IP]US2021374941 (LIU JIE [CN], et al) [IP] 1-15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0063] * | by applicant | US19370173067 |