EP4148999 - ELECTRONIC CIRCUITRY, METHOD, ELECTRONIC SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Electronic Devices & Storage Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Koutaro Tokyo, 105-0023 / JP | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 22159940.0 | 03.03.2022 | [2023/11] | Priority number, date | JP20210149693 | 14.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021149693 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4148999 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/082, H03K17/14 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H03K17/0828 (EP);
H03K17/08 (US);
H02H1/0007 (US);
H02M1/0009 (EP);
H02M1/08 (EP);
H02M1/32 (EP);
H03K17/14 (EP);
H03K5/24 (US);
G05F1/562 (US);
G05F1/573 (US);
H02M1/0012 (EP);
H02M7/5387 (EP);
H03K2005/00013 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE SCHALTUNG, VERFAHREN, ELEKTRONISCHES SYSTEM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMM | [2023/11] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIRCUITRY, METHOD, ELECTRONIC SYSTEM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM | [2023/11] | French: | CIRCUIT ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE | [2023/11] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 13.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2018183228 (HUBER ERWIN [DE]); | [XAI]US2020228109 (BACHHUBER MARCO [DE]) |