EP4029630 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN OPEN-PORE METAL BODY WITH AN OXIDE LAYER AND A METAL BODY PRODUCED BY MEANS OF THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.06.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alantum Europe GmbH Balanstraße 73, Geb. 21 A 81541 München / DE | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walther, Gunnar 01277 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Büttner, Tilo 01277 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Böhm, Hans-Dietrich 01277 Dresden / DE | 04 /
Kieback, Bernd 01277 Dresden / DE | 05 /
Weißgärber, Thomas 01277 Dresden / DE | 06 /
Boden, Arne 01277 Dresden / DE | 07 /
Poss, René 63450 Hanau / DE | 08 /
Andreas, Tillmann 82008 Unterhaching / DE | 09 /
Kolvenbach, Robin 80639 München / DE | 10 /
Torkuhl, Lars 80809 München / DE | 11 /
Gerstle, Alexandra 80807 München / DE | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Frauenkirche 20 01067 Dresden / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 22160770.8 | 18.06.2019 | [2022/29] | Priority number, date | DE201810212110 | 20.07.2018 Original published format: DE102018212110 | [2022/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029630 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/11, B22F7/00, B22F7/02, C22C1/04 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
B22F3/11 (EP,KR,US);
B22F10/14 (EP,KR,US);
B22F10/20 (US);
B22F7/004 (EP);
B22F7/006 (EP,KR,US);
B22F7/008 (EP,KR,US);
B22F7/08 (US);
B33Y10/00 (KR);
B33Y70/10 (KR);
B33Y80/00 (EP,KR,US);
C22C1/08 (EP);
C22C1/088 (KR);
C23C24/00 (US);
C23C28/32 (US);
C23C28/345 (US);
C23C8/12 (US);
C25D3/38 (US);
B22F10/28 (EP,US);
B22F2007/042 (KR,US);
B22F2207/01 (EP,KR,US);
B22F2301/052 (KR,US);
B22F2301/10 (KR,US);
B22F2301/40 (US);
B22F2302/253 (US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,KR);
B33Y70/00 (US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,KR);
Y10T428/12479 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F3/11, B22F2003/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] |
Former [2022/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OFFENPORIGEN METALLKÖRPERS MIT EINER OXIDSCHICHT UND EIN MIT DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER METALLKÖRPER | [2022/29] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN OPEN-PORE METAL BODY WITH AN OXIDE LAYER AND A METAL BODY PRODUCED BY MEANS OF THE METHOD | [2022/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS MÉTALLIQUE À ALVÉOLES OUVERTS DOTÉ D'UNE COUCHE D'OXYDE ET CORPS MÉTALLIQUE FABRIQUÉ SELON LE PROCÉDÉ | [2022/29] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19735224.8 / EP3823780 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2764916 (ALANTUM EUROP GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0011] , [0014] , [0015] , [0017] , [0039] , [0048] , [0049] , [0063] - [0074] *[A] 4 | by applicant | DE3883722T | US2007160518 | US8012598 | US2012302811 | US2013061987 | US2014106962 | US2014221700 |