EP4056987 - CONDUCTIVE PARTICLE DETECTING DEVICE AND MECHANICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.03.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nabtesco Corporation 7-9, Hirakawacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-0093 / JP | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurita, Masakazu Tokyo, 102-0093 / JP | 02 /
Mori, Hiroki Tokyo, 102-0093 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Koji Tokyo, 102-0093 / JP | 04 /
Sakurai, Kazuhiko Tokyo, 102-0093 / JP | 05 /
Harada, Masaki Tokyo, 102-0093 / JP | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 22160777.3 | 08.03.2022 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | JP20210040569 | 12.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021040569 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056987 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/06, G01N33/28 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/2858 (EP,US);
G01N27/07 (KR,US);
G01V3/088 (CN);
G01N15/0656 (EP);
G01N33/2888 (KR);
G01V3/02 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITFÄHIGE TEILCHENDETEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND MECHANISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/37] | English: | CONDUCTIVE PARTICLE DETECTING DEVICE AND MECHANICAL DEVICE | [2022/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE PARTICULES CONDUCTRICES ET DISPOSITIF MÉCANIQUE | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 14.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2019154608 (NAKAMURA KOJI [JP], et al) [I] 1-3,9-11 * figures 1,2c * * paragraphs [0008] , [0033] , [0038] , [0039] , [0045] - [0046] - [0049] - [0050] *[A] 4-8; | [XP]EP3839504 (NABTESCO CORP [JP]) [XP] 9,10 * figures 8-10 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0045] - [0089] - [0090] - [0099] , [0103] * | by applicant | JP2005331324 |