EP4056241 - EQUIPMENT FOR PLAYING BASKETBALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Decathlon 4 Boulevard de Mons 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE CUNFF, Uisant 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | 02 /
DAUCHY, Clément 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | 03 /
LEGACHE, Jérôme 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP 63, Boulevard de Ménilmontant 75011 Paris / FR | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 22160910.0 | 08.03.2022 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | FR20210002296 | 09.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2102296 | [2022/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056241 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4056241 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63B63/08, A63B71/02 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
A63B63/083 (EP,CN,US);
A63B71/023 (EP,US);
A63B2071/025 (EP,US);
A63B2071/026 (EP,US);
A63B2210/50 (EP,US);
A63B2225/093 (EP,US);
A63B2243/0037 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSRÜSTUNG ZUM PRAKTIZIEREN VON BASKETBALL | [2022/37] | English: | EQUIPMENT FOR PLAYING BASKETBALL | [2022/37] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT POUR LA PRATIQUE DU BASKETBALL | [2023/34] |
Former [2022/37] | EQUIPEMENT POUR LA PRATIQUE DU BASKETBALL | Examination procedure | 13.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 13.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.01.2024 | [2024/31] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29513110U (THIEME SPORT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * pages 1-2; figure - *; | [A]US2007010356 (MOLLER JORGEN J JR [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2007232421 (NYE S C [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure -; claim - *; | [AD]FR3022795 (DECATHLON SA [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]FR3022796 (DECATHLON SA [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | FR3022795 | FR3022796 |