EP4060406 - COMPOSITE PHOTORESIST MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MAKING THEREOF, AND FLUID EJECTION HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito Osaka, 574-0013 / JP | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEAVER, Sean T. Lexington, 40508 / US | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22160974.6 | 09.03.2022 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | US202117206344 | 19.03.2021 Original published format: US202117206344 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4060406 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4060406 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/16, G03F7/095, G03F7/004, G03F7/038, G03F7/075 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G03F7/095 (EP);
G03F7/004 (CN,US);
B41J2/1433 (US);
B05B1/00 (CN);
B41J2/1603 (EP,US);
B41J2/162 (EP,US);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1626 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/164 (EP,US);
G03F7/0045 (EP);
G03F7/0046 (EP,US);
G03F7/038 (EP,US);
G03F7/0755 (EP);
G03F7/094 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | G03F7/004, G03F7/038, G03F7/075 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTES FOTORESIST-MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON SOWIE FLUIDAUSSTOSSKOPF | [2022/38] | English: | COMPOSITE PHOTORESIST MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR MAKING THEREOF, AND FLUID EJECTION HEAD | [2022/38] | French: | MATÉRIAU PHOTOSENSIBLE COMPOSITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ, ET TÊTE D'ÉJECTION DE FLUIDE | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 27.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007076060 (WEAVER SEAN T [US], et al); | [A]US2009185003 (BERTELSEN CRAIG MICHAEL [US], et al); | [XI]EP3312011 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]EP3446877 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |