EP4242195 - USE OF PYRAZOLO[3,4-B]PYRIDINE COMPOUNDS AS NITRIFICATION INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EuroChem Antwerpen Scheldelaan 600 2040 Antwerpen / BE | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peters, Nils Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Beeckman, Fabian Gent / BE | 03 /
Motte, Hans Gent / BE | 04 /
Drozdzecki, Andrzej Gent / BE | 05 /
Audenaert, Dominique Gent / BE | 06 /
Beeckman, Tom Gent / BE | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Willnegger, Eva Montgomery IP Boulevard Saint Michel 10/4 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 22161222.9 | 09.03.2022 | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4242195 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C05G3/90 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
C05G3/90 (EP);
Y02P60/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PYRAZOLO[3,4-B]PYRIDINVERBINDUNGEN ALS NITRIFIKATIONSINHIBITOR | [2023/37] | English: | USE OF PYRAZOLO[3,4-B]PYRIDINE COMPOUNDS AS NITRIFICATION INHIBITOR | [2023/37] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSÉS PYRAZOLO[3,4-B]PYRIDINE COMME INHIBITEUR DE NITRIFICATION | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/33] | 05.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1670578 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR); | [X]US2015232459 (IIJIMA TORU [JP], et al); | [X]WO2018013867 (MARINEAU JASON J [US], et al); | [I]US10556844 (NAVE BARBARA [DE], et al) | by applicant | DE4128828 | WO9624566 | US6139596 | DE10230593 | EP1120388 | EP1820788 | WO2010100475 | WO2011032904 | WO2013121384 | WO2015086823 | WO2016207210 | US2018016199 | US2020062755 | WO2021EP75026 |