EP4056314 - POLISHING PAD, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND METHOD OF FABRICATING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK enpulse Co., Ltd. 1043, Gyeonggi-daero Pyeongtaek-si, Gyeonggi-do 17784 / KR | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/37] | For all designated states SKC Solmics Co., Ltd. Gyeonggi-daero Pyeongtaek-si, Gyeonggi-do 17784 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Jong Wook 03142 Seoul / KR | 02 /
JOENG, Eun Sun 16338 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
YUN, Sung Hoon 03142 Seoul / KR | 04 /
HEO, Hye Young 16338 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
SEO, Jang Won 03142 Seoul / KR | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | BCKIP Part mbB Siegfriedstraße 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | BCKIP Siegfriedstraße 8 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22161518.0 | 11.03.2022 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | KR20210032904 | 12.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210032904 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056314 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/24 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
B24B37/24 (EP,CN,KR);
B24B37/042 (US);
B24B37/044 (KR);
B24B37/107 (CN);
B24B37/22 (US);
B24B37/26 (CN);
B24D11/001 (CN);
B24D18/00 (KR);
B24D3/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLIERKISSEN, VERFAHREN ZUM PRODUZIEREN DESSELBEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON HALBLEITERANORDNUNGEN UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN | [2022/37] | English: | POLISHING PAD, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME AND METHOD OF FABRICATING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE USING THE SAME | [2022/37] | French: | TAMPON DE POLISSAGE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR L'UTILISANT | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 13.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013303061 (JAMES DAVID B [US], et al); | [XI]US2018311792 (QIAN BAINIAN [US], et al); | [A]KR20190029473 (SKC CO LTD [KR]); | [A]WO2020254916 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) |