EP4242509 - TILTING DEVICE FOR PIVOTING OBJECTS AND USE OF THE TILTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states van Riel, Markus Bärenacker 2 8222 Beringen / CH | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behrmann Wagner PartG mbB Hegau-Tower Maggistraße 5 (11. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 22161607.1 | 11.03.2022 | [2023/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4242509 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/12, F16M11/18 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
F16M11/123 (EP);
F16M11/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2023/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEIGEVORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHWENKEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN SOWIE VERWENDUNG DER NEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/37] | English: | TILTING DEVICE FOR PIVOTING OBJECTS AND USE OF THE TILTING DEVICE | [2023/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INCLINAISON PERMETTANT DE FAIRE PIVOTER DES OBJETS, AINSI QU'UTILISATION DU DISPOSITIF D'INCLINAISON | [2023/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 04.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]CN202100903U (UNIV SHANTOU) [X] 1,3,4,6,9,13,14 * figure 1 * [A] 7,8,11,12 [I] 2,5; | [A]US8616799 (ERSOY METIN [DE])[A] 5; | [XAI]WO2017108997 (RAISE DESIGN LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,13,14 * page 1, lines 26-30; claims 1,2,4 * * page 2, line 21 * * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 2; figure 2 * [A] 7,8,11,12 [I] 5,6,9,10; | [XAI]CN211315592U (WUHAN FEILING ROBOT TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-4,13,14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0 19]; figure 1 * [A] 7,8,11,12 [I] 5,6,9,10 |