EP4060330 - X-RAY INSPECTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISHIDA CO., Ltd. 44, Sanno-cho, Shogoin Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8392 / JP | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states ISHIDA CO., Ltd. 44, Sanno-cho Shogoin Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8392 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORI, Hiroshi Shiga, 520-3026 / JP | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22161763.2 | 14.03.2022 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | JP20210045659 | 19.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021045659 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4060330 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4060330 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/18 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
G01N23/18 (EP,KR);
G01N23/04 (CN,KR,US);
G01N23/083 (KR);
G01V5/20 (US);
G21F3/00 (CN,KR,US);
G01N2223/1016 (CN,KR);
G01N2223/30 (US);
G01N2223/317 (EP);
G01N2223/3307 (KR);
G01N2223/40 (US);
G01N2223/618 (EP);
G01N2223/643 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RÖNTGENPRÜFVORRICHTUNG | [2022/38] | English: | X-RAY INSPECTION APPARATUS | [2022/38] | French: | APPAREIL À RAYONS X | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 15.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2003107016 (ANRITSU CORP); | [A]JP2003185602 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [XYI]JP2004233206 (ANRITSU SANKI SYS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2007183201 |