EP4086243 - CATALYST AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLIC ACID FROM HYDROXYMETHYLFURFURAL IN WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Archer Daniels Midland Company 4666 Faries Parkway Decatur, Illinois 62526 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanborn, Alexandra Lincoln, 62656 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 22161787.1 | 05.08.2015 | [2022/45] | Priority number, date | US201462038923P | 19.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462038923 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086243 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/68, B01J8/20, B01J23/46 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
C07D307/68 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/462 (EP,KR,US);
C07D307/44 (KR);
Y02P20/584 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2,5-FURANDICARBONSÄURE AUS HYDROMETHYLFURFURAL IN WASSER | [2022/45] | English: | CATALYST AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING 2,5-FURANDICARBOXYLIC ACID FROM HYDROXYMETHYLFURFURAL IN WATER | [2022/45] | French: | CATALYSEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDE 2,5-FURANEDICARBOXYLIQUE À PARTIR D'HYDROXYMÉTHYLFURFURAL DANS L'EAU | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15834376.4 / EP3183241 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH03130247 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND) [Y] 3-6 * see claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2013106136 (ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND CO [US]) [Y] 7,8* see claim 1 and all corresponding examples *; | [IY] - YURY Y GORBANEV ET AL, "Effect of Support in Heterogeneous Ruthenium Catalysts Used for the Selective Aerobic Oxidation of HMF in Water", TOPICS IN CATALYSIS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20110907), vol. 54, no. 16 - 18, doi:10.1007/S11244-011-9754-2, ISSN 1572-9028, pages 1318 - 1324, XP019970070 [I] 1,2 * see scheme 1 and oxidation reactions under item 2.3 * [Y] 3-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11244-011-9754-2 | [IY] - YURY Y GORBANEV ET AL, "Selective Aerobic Oxidation of 5-Hydroxymethylfurfural in Water Over Solid Ruthenium Hydroxide Catalysts with Magnesium-Based Supports", CATALYSIS LETTERS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20111001), vol. 141, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S10562-011-0707-Y, ISSN 1572-879X, pages 1752 - 1760, XP019982038 [I] 1,2 * see oxidation reactions under item 2.3 * [Y] 3-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10562-011-0707-y | by applicant | GB621971 | US5622655 | US5842497 | US7317116 | JP2009023916 | US2009156841 | US7678950 | US7897794 | WO2011023491 | WO2011023590 | WO2011043661 | US8193382 | WO2013033058 | WO2013106136 | - R.D. SANDERSON et al., Journal of Appl. Pol. Sci., (19940000), vol. 53, pages 1785 - 1793 | - ZHAO et al., Science, (20070615), vol. 316, pages 1597 - 1600 | - BICKER et al., Green Chemistry, (20030000), vol. 5, pages 280 - 284 | - CASANOVA et al., "Biomass into Chemicals: Aerobic Oxidation of 5-Hydroxymethyl-2-furfural into 2,5-Furandicarboxylic Acid with Gold Nanoparticle Catalysts", ChemSusChem, (20090000), vol. 2, doi:10.1002/cssc.200900137, pages 1138 - 1144, XP055602882 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cssc.200900137 | - ZOPE et al., "Influence of Reaction Conditions on Diacid Formation During Au-Catalyzed Oxidation of Glycerol and hydroxymethylfurfural", Topics in Catalysis, (20120000), vol. 55, doi:10.1007/s11244-012-9777-3, pages 24 - 32, XP035023010 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11244-012-9777-3 | - GORBANEV et al., "Effect of Support in Heterogeneous Ruthenium Catalysts Used for the Selective Aerobic Oxidation of HMF in Water", Topics in Catalysis, (20110000), vol. 54, doi:10.1007/s11244-011-9754-2, pages 1318 - 1324, XP055546021 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11244-011-9754-2 | - SAKAI et al., "Effect of Lignocellulose-Derived Inhibitors on Growth of and Ethanol Production by Growth-Arrested Corynebacterium glutamicum R", Applied and Environmental Biology, (20070400), vol. 73, no. 7, doi:10.1128/AEM.02880-06, pages 2349 - 2353, XP002536040 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.02880-06 |