EP4059866 - EDIBLE MULTI-RING CAN-HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | 08.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E6PR S.A.P.I DE C.V. Bosque de Radiatas No. 22, Desp. 404. Col. Bosques de las Lomas, Deleg. Cuajimalpa de Morelos 05120 Mexico City / MX | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAURIA, Gustavo Adolfo Brooklyn, NY, 11211 / US | 02 /
GARCIA CENDEJAS, Juan Francisco 14140 Tlalpan / MX | 03 /
VEGA MALPICA, Marco Antonio Darien, 06820 / US | 04 /
JOSHINA, Jaime Koji Miami, 33145 / US | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22161790.5 | 06.07.2017 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | US201662361780P | 13.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662361780 P | US201715590754 | 09.05.2017 Original published format: US201715590754 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059866 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4059866 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/50, D21J3/02, D21H27/10 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
D21J3/02 (EP,US);
B65D65/463 (EP,US);
B65D71/50 (EP,US);
B65D71/504 (EP,US);
D21B1/063 (EP,US);
D21H11/12 (US);
D21H17/01 (US);
D21H21/16 (US);
D21H27/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ESSBARER MEHRRINGDOSENHALTER | [2022/38] | English: | EDIBLE MULTI-RING CAN-HOLDER | [2022/38] | French: | PORTE-CANETTES MULTI-ANNEAUX COMESTIBLE | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 21.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17828192.9 / EP3484785 | Divisional application(s) | EP24160809.0 / EP4375419 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5186321 (FADUS RICHARD F [US]); | [A]WO03044279 (GRENIDEA TECHNOLOGIES PTE LTD [SG], et al) |