EP4060215 - PIPE COUPLING FOR COUPLING TWO PIPES WITH DIFFERENT EXTERNAL DIAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.D.S. Meyer GmbH Hansatal 2 49456 Bakum / DE | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2022/45] |
Former [2022/38] | 01 /
Meyer, Ludgerus 22607 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Meyer, Ludgerus Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22161867.1 | 14.03.2022 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | DE202120101368U | 17.03.2021 Original published format: DE 202021101368 U | [2022/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4060215 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/38] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP4060215 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
F16L25/14 (EP);
F16L21/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRKUPPLUNG ZUR KOPPLUNG ZWEIER ROHRE MIT UNTERSCHIEDLICHEN AUSSENDURCHMESSERN | [2022/38] | English: | PIPE COUPLING FOR COUPLING TWO PIPES WITH DIFFERENT EXTERNAL DIAMETERS | [2022/38] | French: | RACCORD DE TUBE DESTINÉ AU RACCORDEMENT DE DEUX TUBES DE DIAMÈTRES EXTÉRIEURS DIFFÉRENTS | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 14.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE202010013624U (M D S MEYER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,7* figures 4, 8, 9 *; | [XA]US8651532 (FELBER WINFRIED [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-8 * column 4, lines 333-42, 60; figures 1, 2 * * column 5, line 24 * * column 6, lines 60-61 * [A] 2,4,9 | by applicant | DE2109566 | DE202010013624U | EP3354953 |