EP4079645 - SEALING STATION WITH A PRODUCT PROTECTION PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, SK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULTIVAC Sepp Haggenmüller SE & Co. KG Bahnhofstrasse 4 87787 Wolfertschwenden / DE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gabler, Albert 87760 Lachen-Albishofen / DE | 02 /
Huber, Michael 87764 Maria Steinbach / DE | 03 /
Pekarek, Nikolas 87437 Kempten / DE | 04 /
Petermichl, Sascha 87763 Lautrach / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 22162184.0 | 15.03.2022 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | DE202110110382 | 23.04.2021 Original published format: DE102021110382 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079645 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4079645 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65B7/16, B65B9/04, B65B51/14, B65B59/04 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B65B9/04 (EP);
B65B31/006 (US);
B65B31/028 (US);
B65B51/14 (EP);
B65B59/04 (EP);
B65B7/164 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SIEGELSTATION MIT EINER PRODUKTSCHUTZPLATTE | [2022/43] | English: | SEALING STATION WITH A PRODUCT PROTECTION PLATE | [2022/43] | French: | POSTE D'EMBALLAGE DOTÉ D'UNE PLAQUE DE PROTECTION DU PRODUIT | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 11.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 19.07.2023 | |
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 19.07.2023 | |
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 19.07.2023 | |
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE102012006696 (MULTIVAC HAGGENMUELLER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraph [0025]; figure 2 *; | [AD]DE102018114263 (MULTIVAC HAGGENMUELLER KG [DE]) [AD] 1-10* paragraph [0062]; figure 3 * | by applicant | DE102012006696 | DE102018114263 |