EP4071976 - ELECTRIC MOTOR WITH SIMPLIFIED WINDING AND DUAL ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANGUDU, Jagadeesh South Windsor, 06074 / US | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 22162305.1 | 15.03.2022 | [2022/41] | Priority number, date | US202117223303 | 06.04.2021 Original published format: US202117223303 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071976 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/12, H02K3/46, H02K21/12, H02K1/02, H02K16/02, // H02K21/22, H02K21/16 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H02K16/02 (EP,US);
H02K1/20 (US);
H02K1/278 (US);
H02K1/2786 (US);
H02K21/12 (EP);
H02K3/12 (EP);
H02K3/28 (US);
H02K3/46 (EP);
H02K1/02 (EP);
H02K1/2783 (EP);
H02K1/2792 (EP);
H02K21/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] |
Former [2022/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMOTOR MIT VEREINFACHTER WICKLUNG UND DOPPELROTOR | [2022/41] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR WITH SIMPLIFIED WINDING AND DUAL ROTOR | [2022/41] | French: | MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE DOTÉ D'UN ENROULEMENT SIMPLIFIÉ ET D'UN DOUBLE ROTOR | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 12.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29702117U (KNESTEL ANTON [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * page 3, lines 72-85; figures 1-2 ** page 2, lines 40-63 *; | [XI]EP3355446 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,11,13-15 * paragraph [0026]; figures 7,9-10 * [I] 5,12; | [X]US2020227988 (ZHU ZIQIANG [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0064] , [0096]; figures 1-4 * |