EP4071040 - COUPLING ARRANGEMENT AND TRANSPORT DEVICE WITH COUPLING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indorf Apparatebau GmbH Poststraße 13 29664 Walsrode / DE | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Michael 22880 Wedel / DE | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 22162553.6 | 16.03.2022 | [2022/41] | Priority number, date | DE202120101843U | 07.04.2021 Original published format: DE 202021101843 U | [2022/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071040 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B62K27/12, B62K27/04, B62D63/06, B62K27/06, // B60D1/00 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B62D63/061 (EP);
B62D63/064 (EP);
B62K27/003 (EP);
B62K27/04 (EP);
B62K27/06 (EP);
B62K27/12 (EP);
B60D2001/003 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPPLUNGSANORDNUNG SOWIE TRANSPORTGERÄT MIT KUPPLUNGSANORDNUNG | [2022/41] | English: | COUPLING ARRANGEMENT AND TRANSPORT DEVICE WITH COUPLING ARRANGEMENT | [2022/41] | French: | AGENCEMENT D'ACCOUPLEMENT, AINSI QUE APPAREIL DE TRANSPORT POURVU D'AGENCEMENT D'ACCOUPLEMENT | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/40] | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE4427036 (POTH KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1-6,11-13,18 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * [I] 16,17; | [XI]DE19609910 (DONNER WILFRIED [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-15,18 * columns 4,5; figures 1-7c * [I] 16,17; | [X]DE19820942 (HEINZE CORVIN [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2006186634 (GIESE CURTIS F [US]) [A] 1-6* figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP2487094 (PERUZZO PAOLA [IT]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-8 * |