EP4060270 - METHOD FOR REPAIRING A HEARTH OF A FURNACE BY INJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IRF Europa S.r.l. Via Einaudi 20 31030 Casier / IT | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORDONE, Charles 42320 CELLIEU / FR | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22162808.4 | 17.03.2022 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | FR20210002681 | 17.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2102681 | [2022/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4060270 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F27D1/16 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
F27D1/16 (EP);
C03B5/42 (EP);
F27D1/1636 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REPARIEREN EINES BACKOFENBODENS DURCH EINSPRITZEN | [2022/38] | English: | METHOD FOR REPAIRING A HEARTH OF A FURNACE BY INJECTION | [2022/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉPARATION D'UNE SOLE D'UN FOUR PAR INJECTION | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 15.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0062986 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [X] 12 * page 3 * * figures 2,3 *[I] 13; | [XI]US7021913 (SNEED CALVIN [US]) [X] 1 * figures 4,5 * * column 2 * [I] 2-11 |