EP4062731 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTONOMOUS WORK MACHINE APPROVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Donini, Mario L 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Wassilak, Erich 68163 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Johnson, David A 68163 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Maeder, Curtis A 68163 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
Runde, Jeffrey E 68163 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
Ascherl, Margaux M 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 22162835.7 | 17.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | US202163164196P | 22.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163164196 P | US202217691475 | 10.03.2022 Original published format: US202217691475 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4062731 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01B69/04, A01D34/00, A01D41/127 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
A01B69/008 (EP);
G05D1/0038 (IL);
G05D1/0214 (CN);
G05D1/0016 (US);
A01D34/008 (EP);
A01D41/1278 (EP);
G05D1/0022 (US);
G05D1/0219 (US);
G05D1/0278 (CN);
G05D1/0285 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTONOMEN ZULASSUNG VON ARBEITSMASCHINEN | [2022/39] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTONOMOUS WORK MACHINE APPROVAL | [2022/39] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPROBATION DE MACHINE DE TRAVAIL AUTONOME | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017357400 (FOSTER CHRISTOPHER ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1,9* abstract *; | [A]US2020159220 (HURD COLIN JOSH [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0053] * |