EP4082800 - INK CARTRIDGE, CARTRIDGE HOLDING MECHANISM, AND PRINTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT, SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito Osaka, 574-0013 / JP | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKA, Junpei Osaka, 574-0013 / JP | 02 /
HORI, Kohsuke Osaka, 574-0013 / JP | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 22162985.0 | 18.03.2022 | [2022/44] | Priority number, date | JP20210074208 | 26.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021074208 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082800 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4082800 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J29/13 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
B41J2/17503 (EP,CN);
B41J2/17523 (EP,US);
B41J2/17506 (EP);
B41J2/17509 (EP);
B41J2/17513 (CN);
B41J2/1752 (EP);
B41J2/1754 (US);
B41J2/17543 (CN);
B41J2/17553 (EP);
B41J29/13 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] |
Former [2022/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TINTENPATRONE, KARTUSCHENHALTEVORRICHTUNG UND DRUCKVORRICHTUNG | [2022/44] | English: | INK CARTRIDGE, CARTRIDGE HOLDING MECHANISM, AND PRINTING APPARATUS | [2022/44] | French: | CARTOUCHE D'ENCRE, MÉCANISME DE SUPPORT DE CARTOUCHE ET IMPRIMANTE | [2022/44] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 29.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.01.2024 | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 31.01.2024 | |
BG | 31.01.2024 | ||
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0734867 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [A]US6172695 (LIU WIN-YIN [TW]); | [Y]EP1069990 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP1384589 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2013044753 (PRINT RITE UNICORN IMAGE PRODUCTS CO LTD ZHUHAI [CN], et al); | [A]US2017326882 (OKUDE KYOSHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]EP3797999 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2002370384 | WO2007142263 | JP2008006808 | JP2012196776 | JP2019171734 |