EP4245755 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGH-PURITY MELAMINE FROM UREA PYROLYSIS, WITH REDUCED ENERGY CONSUMPTION AND IMPROVED INTEGRATION WITH THE UREA PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proman AG Samstagernstrasse 41 8832 Wollerau Schwyz / CH | [2023/39] |
Former [2023/38] | For all designated states EUROTECNICA MELAMINE AG Samstagernstrasse 41 8832 Wollerau / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE AMICIS, Alberto I-20097 San Donato Milanese (MI) / IT | 02 /
DI RUOCCO, Giuseppe I-23900 Lecco / IT | 03 /
FLORINDI, Americo I-20025 Legnano (MI) / IT | 04 /
PETRILLO, Francesca I-20161 Milano / IT | 05 /
BOGOTTO, Mattia I-20148 Milano / IT | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al BIRD & BIRD SOCIETA TRA AVVOCATI S.R.L. Via Porlezza, 12 20123 Milano / IT | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 22163423.1 | 22.03.2022 | [2023/38] | Priority number, date | IT20220004898 | 14.03.2022 Original published format: IT202200004898 | [2023/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245755 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/60 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
C07D251/60 (EP,CN);
C01C1/024 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2023/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEM MELAMIN AUS HARNSTOFFPYROLYSE MIT REDUZIERTEM ENERGIEVERBRAUCH UND VERBESSERTER INTEGRATION MIT DER HARNSTOFFANLAGE | [2023/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGH-PURITY MELAMINE FROM UREA PYROLYSIS, WITH REDUCED ENERGY CONSUMPTION AND IMPROVED INTEGRATION WITH THE UREA PLANT | [2023/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MÉLAMINE À GRANDE PURETÉ À PARTIR DE PYROLYSE D'URÉE, À CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE RÉDUITE ET INTÉGRATION AMÉLIORÉE AVEC L'INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'URÉE | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 15.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02100839 (EUROTECNICA DEV & LICENSING S [IT], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 11; claim - *; | [Y]ITMI20081185 (EUROTECNICA MELAMINE LUXEMBOURG) [Y] 1-7 * claim - *; | [YD]EP2385043 (EUROTECNICA MELAMINE LUXEMBOURG ZWEIGNIEDERLASSUNG IN ITTIGEN [CH]) [YD] 1-7* claim - * | by applicant | US3161638 | US7125992 | EP2385043 |