EP4067736 - POSITIONING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B Lighted B.V. Blarenberglaan 23J 2800 Mechelen / BE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERVLIET, Patrick Georgette Karel 2800 MECHELEN / BE | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22164294.5 | 25.03.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | BE20210005240 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: BE 202105240 | [2022/40] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067736 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/04, F21V17/16, // F21S8/02 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
F21V21/047 (EP);
F21V17/164 (EP);
F21V17/168 (EP);
H02G3/123 (EP);
H02G3/20 (EP);
H02G3/36 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONIERPLATTE | [2022/40] | English: | POSITIONING PLATE | [2022/40] | French: | PLAQUE DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 04.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2617946 (PERCHE ETS [FR], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * page 4, line 7 - page 7, line 14; figures 1-5 * [A] 10; | [YA]FR2669098 (DAVID FRANCIS [FR]) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * page 2, line 14 - page 5, line 26; figures 1,2 * [A] 10; | [A]GB2359848 (ILLUMA LIGHTING LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 18 - page 4, line 6; figures 1-6 *; | [YA]EP1672760 (SCHNABL LUDWIG [AT]) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0033]; figures 1-10 *[A] 10; | [YA]EP2128945 (CAVALLO CARLO [IT], et al) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0040]; figures 1-4 * [A] 10; | [A]EP3428509 (BARTENBACH HOLDING GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0063]; figure 1 *; | [YA]BE1026631 (VERLICHTING MORTIER BVBA [BE]) [Y] 1-9,11-15 * page 7, line 9 - page 10, line 27; figures 1-4; claims 1-14 * [A] 10 |