EP4184323 - PERFORMANCE TUNING IN A NETWORK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juniper Networks, Inc. 1133 Innovation Way Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Shailender Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | 02 /
MARIAPPAN, Yuvaraja Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | 03 /
VARIMALLA, Rakesh Kumar Reddy Sunnyvale, 94089 / US | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/21] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 22164449.5 | 25.03.2022 | [2023/21] | Priority number, date | US202117455867 | 19.11.2021 Original published format: US202117455867 | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4184323 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
G06F9/5072 (EP,US);
H04L67/1074 (CN);
G06F9/5044 (US);
G06F9/4856 (US);
G06F9/505 (EP,US);
H04L41/0803 (CN);
G06F2209/501 (US);
G06F2209/5011 (US);
G06F2209/503 (EP,US);
G06F2209/505 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] |
Former [2023/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSABSTIMMUNG IN EINEM NETZWERKSYSTEM | [2023/21] | English: | PERFORMANCE TUNING IN A NETWORK SYSTEM | [2023/21] | French: | OPTIMISATION DE PERFORMANCES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 21.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2018157536 (JIANG FEIHU [CN], et al); | [I]US2021014114 (DOSHI KSHITIJ ARUN [US], et al) | by applicant | US9571394 | US10728145 | WO2013US44378 |