EP4253669 - MEASURING SYSTEM FOR A BUILDING AND WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBA Mobile Automation AG Kapellenstrasse 15 65555 Limburg / DE | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harms, Volker 65555 Limburg / DE | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Pfitzner, Hannes, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstraße 2 81373 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22164977.5 | 29.03.2022 | [2023/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4253669 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/26, G01S17/89, G06T17/00 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
E02F9/264 (EP);
G01S7/497 (US);
G01S17/89 (EP);
G01S17/894 (US);
G06T17/00 (EP);
G06T7/521 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERMESSUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINE BAU- UND ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2023/40] | English: | MEASURING SYSTEM FOR A BUILDING AND WORKING MACHINE | [2023/40] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MESURE POUR UNE MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION ET DE TRAVAIL | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 30.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2018099755 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2020041897 (CAMSO INC [CA]) [Y] 7,15 * page 18, line 16 - page 19, line 5; figures 9,10,51 *; | [XY]US2022070611 (READY-CAMPBELL NOAH AUSTEN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-14,16 * paragraphs [0047] , [0068]; figures 1,2A,2B,3 * [Y] 7,15; | [A]US2022075027 (KAHANA NIR [IL], et al) [A] 1,14* abstract *; | [A]US2022081879 (HARADA JUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,14 * paragraphs [0036] , [0069]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP3971608 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0011]; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP3613905 | EP3730702 |