EP4080690 - CONNECTOR APPARATUS WITH SWITCH FOR IMPROVING CONTACT RELIABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UJU ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 61, Chorok-ro 532beon-gil Yanggam-myeon Hwaseong-si, Gyeonggi-do 18627 / KR | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Jung-Kyu Hwaseong-si 18498 / KR | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Verscht, Thomas Kurt Albert Josephsburgstrasse 88 A 81673 München / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 22165225.8 | 29.03.2022 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | KR20210051725 | 21.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210051725 | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080690 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/627, H01R13/641, H01R13/703, // H01R13/436 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
H01R13/7032 (EP);
H01R13/641 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/629 (US);
H01R13/6272 (EP,US);
H01R13/639 (KR,US);
H01R13/4362 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDERVORRICHTUNG MIT SCHALTER ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER KONTAKTZUVERLÄSSIGKEIT | [2022/43] | English: | CONNECTOR APPARATUS WITH SWITCH FOR IMPROVING CONTACT RELIABILITY | [2022/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONNECTEUR DOTÉ D'UN COMMUTATEUR POUR AMÉLIORER LA FIABILITÉ DE CONTACT | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 05.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2001027054 (FUKUDA MASARU [JP]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I]US6422894 (ENDO TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1455423 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3214705 (DAI-ICHI SEIKO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [I]US2018034184 (SEKINO TETSUYA [JP], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | KR101886959B |