EP4253796 - TRANSMISSION FOR A WIND TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESTAS WIND SYSTEMS A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRÖDER, Tim Niklas Dortmund / DE | 02 /
WIMMER, Thomas Tauberrettersheim / DE | 03 /
INGELI, Jan Hattlingen / DE | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22165254.8 | 29.03.2022 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4253796 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16H25/06, F03D15/10, F16H57/04 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
F16H57/0486 (EP);
F03D15/10 (EP);
F03D80/707 (EP);
F16H25/06 (EP);
F16H57/0423 (EP);
F16H57/0426 (EP);
F16H57/043 (EP);
F16H57/0471 (EP);
F05B2260/4031 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBE FÜR EINE WINDTURBINE | [2023/40] | English: | TRANSMISSION FOR A WIND TURBINE | [2023/40] | French: | TRANSMISSION POUR ÉOLIENNE | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]RU2165552 (VOROSHILOV ALEKSANDR SERGEEVIC) [X] 1,8-11,14 * figures 13-19 * * paragraphs [0056] - [0074] * [A] 13 [Y] 2-7,12 [I] 15; | [Y]WO2008119418 (WITTENSTEIN AG [DE], et al) [Y] 12 * figures 1, 3a, 3c ** the whole document *; | [Y]DE102015223554 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 2-7 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0024] *; | [Y]DE102016209654 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2-7 * figures 1, 2, 3 * * the whole document * | by applicant | US8256327 | US8656809 | US10830328 |