EP4059861 - DOLLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEP Technology Pty Limited Level 29 255 George Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | [2023/26] |
Former [2022/38] | For all designated states CHEP Technology Pty Limited Level 10 Angel Place 123 Pitt Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKYAR, Sanjiv Surrey, GU18 5XZ / GB | 02 /
WESSON, Karl Michael Surrey, GU18 5XZS / GB | 03 /
COPE, Andy 3970 Leopoldsburg / BE | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Morbidini, Marco Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22165708.3 | 30.01.2017 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | GB20160001616 | 28.01.2016 Original published format: GB 201601616 | GB20160001705 | 29.01.2016 Original published format: GB 201601705 | GB20160015479 | 12.09.2016 Original published format: GB 201615479 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059861 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/42, B65D19/44, B62B3/16, B62B5/00, B60B33/00, B62B3/14, B65D19/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
B62B3/16 (EP,RU,US);
B65D19/0095 (EP,CN,US);
B60B33/00 (EP,US);
B60B33/006 (EP,US);
B60B33/028 (EP,US);
B62B3/1492 (US);
B62B5/00 (US);
B62B5/0093 (EP);
B65D19/0024 (CN);
B65D19/42 (CN,US);
B65D19/44 (EP,CN,US);
B60B2900/325 (EP,US);
B60B2900/551 (EP,US);
B60B33/0068 (US);
B62B2203/60 (US);
B62B2301/0465 (EP,US);
B62B2301/254 (US);
B62B2501/065 (US);
B65D2519/00029 (EP,CN);
B65D2519/00034 (EP,CN,US);
B65D2519/00044 (EP);
B65D2519/00064 (EP,CN,US);
B65D2519/00099 (EP);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,CN,US);
B65D2519/00293 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00323 (EP,CN,US);
B65D2519/00333 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROLLWAGEN | [2022/38] | English: | DOLLY | [2022/38] | French: | CHARIOT | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 20.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17743827.2 / EP3408185 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9842523 (WIN WIN INTERNATIONAL PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]EP1529733 (GEBHARDT TRANSPORT & LAGERSYS [DE]); | [XAI]DE202010013118U (GEBHARDT TRANSPORT & LAGERSYS [DE]); | [XY]EP2671814 (HARTWALL K OY AB [FI]) |