EP4080116 - FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR BOILERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windhager Zentralheizung Technik GmbH Anton-Windhager-Strasse 20 5201 Seekirchen a.W. / AT | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLINGER, Martin 5102 Anthering / AT | 02 /
SCHWEIGHOFER, Thomas 5162 Obertrum / AT | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 22165778.6 | 31.03.2022 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | AT20210050238 | 06.04.2021 Original published format: AT 502382021 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080116 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4080116 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F23B50/12, F23K3/16, B65D88/68, B65G53/46 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
F23B50/12 (EP,AT);
F23K3/16 (EP,AT);
F23K2203/102 (AT);
F23K2203/104 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] |
Former [2022/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZUFUHRSYSTEM FÜR HEIZKESSEL | [2022/43] | English: | FUEL SUPPLY SYSTEM FOR BOILERS | [2022/43] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN COMBUSTIBLE POUR CHAUDIÈRES | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 11.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.01.2024 | ES | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 03.01.2024 | |
ES | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 03.01.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 03.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2358404 (TOBIAS HERBERT L [CA], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 2 ** figures 1,2 *; | [AD]WO2007040402 (BIONORDIC AS [NO], et al) [AD] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 12 * * figures 1-3 *; | [AD]US7318431 (HOLTAN MARK N [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 18 * * figures 3,8-11 *; | [A]CN110131886 (ZHU SHAOBO) [A] 1 * machine translation;; example 4 * * figures 6,7 * | by applicant | WO2007040402 | US7318431 | EP1967793 |