EP4109296 - DYNAMIC DATA PROCESSING FOR A SEMANTIC DATA STORAGE ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP SE Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoppermann, Simon 69190 Walldorf / DE | 02 /
Frasch, Janick 69190 Walldorf / DE | 03 /
Sres, Andre 69190 Walldorf / DE | 04 /
Jolfaei, Masoud Aghadavoodi 69190 Walldorf / DE | 05 /
Hin, Mirko 69190 Walldorf / DE | 06 /
Rommel, Roman 69190 Walldorf / DE | 07 /
McKellar, Brian 69190 Walldorf / DE | 08 /
Knoeller, Steffen 69190 Walldorf / DE | 09 /
Bianchino, Santo 69190 Walldorf / DE | 10 /
Lu, Kuan 69190 Walldorf / DE | 11 /
Heere, Dominik 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 22165857.8 | 31.03.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | US202117356914 | 24.06.2021 Original published format: US202117356914 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109296 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/335, G06F16/36, G06F16/383, G06F16/31 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06F16/335 (EP);
G06F16/213 (US);
G06F16/245 (US);
G06F16/252 (US);
G06F16/316 (EP);
G06F16/367 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE DATENVERARBEITUNG FÜR EINE SEMANTISCHE DATENSPEICHERARCHITEKTUR | [2022/52] | English: | DYNAMIC DATA PROCESSING FOR A SEMANTIC DATA STORAGE ARCHITECTURE | [2022/52] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES DYNAMIQUES POUR UNE ARCHITECTURE DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES SÉMANTIQUES | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 23.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2016092557 (STOJANOVIC ALEXANDER SASHA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] * * paragraphs [0053] - [0056]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0057] - [0060]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0061] - [0099]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0197] - [0206]; figure 19 *; | [I]US2019354544 (HERTZ SHAI [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraphs [0073] - [0075] - [0 78] * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0118] * * paragraph [0146] * * paragraphs [0156] - [0159]; figure 7 * * paragraphs [0161] - [0162] - [ 168] * * paragraphs [0175] , [ 178] - [0181] - [ 184] , [ 189] * * paragraph [0206] * * paragraph [0272] *; | [I] - LE-PHUOC DANH ET AL, "The Graph of Things: A step towards the Live Knowledge Graph of connected things", WEB SEMANTICS: SCIENCE, SERVICES AND AGENTS ON THE WORLD WIDE WEB, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20160301), vol. 37-38, doi:10.1016/j.websem.2016.02.003, ISSN 1570-8268, pages 25 - 35, XP055893557 [I] 1-15 * page 27, column r, paragraph l - page 29, column l, paragraph 1; figures 2,3 * * page 29, column l, paragraph 2 - page 30, column r, paragraph 5; figures 4-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.websem.2016.02.003 | [I] - DELIGIANNIS KIMON ET AL, "Hydria: An Online Data Lake for Multi-Faceted Analytics in the Cultural Heritage Domain", BIG DATA AND COGNITIVE COMPUTING, vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.3390/bdcc4020007, (20200423), page 7, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/bdcc4020007, XP055961040 [I] 1-15 * page 6, paragraph l - page 13, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * * page 19, paragraphs 1-last; figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/bdcc4020007 |