EP4068421 - COMPOSITE CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, CATHODE AND LITHIUM BATTERY CONTAINING COMPOSITE CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAPYLOU, Andrei 17084 Yongin-si / KR | 02 /
MOON, Jongseok 17084 Yongin-si / KR | 03 /
SON, Inhyuk 17084 Yongin-si / KR | 04 /
KIM, Guesung 17084 Yongin-si / KR | 05 /
CHERNYSHOV, Denis 17084 Yongin-si / KR | 06 /
MAH, Sangkook 17084 Yongin-si / KR | 07 /
JO, Sungnim 17084 Yongin-si / KR | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22166146.5 | 31.03.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | KR20210042810 | 01.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210042810 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068421 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/1315, H01M4/13915, H01M4/36, H01M4/525, H01M4/62 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/366 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/36 (CN);
C01G53/42 (KR);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M4/1315 (EP);
H01M4/13915 (EP);
H01M4/505 (KR,US);
H01M4/62 (EP,KR);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2004/80 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDKATHODENAKTIVMATERIAL, KATHODE UND LITHIUMBATTERIE, DIE VERBUNDKATHODENAKTIVMATERIAL ENTHALTEN, UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAVON | [2022/40] | English: | COMPOSITE CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, CATHODE AND LITHIUM BATTERY CONTAINING COMPOSITE CATHODE ACTIVE MATERIAL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF | [2022/40] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF DE CATHODE COMPOSITE, CATHODE ET BATTERIE AU LITHIUM CONTENANT LE MATÉRIAU ACTIF À CATHODE COMPOSITE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 04.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2011165463 (CHANG SUNG KYUN [KR], et al) [Y] 14 * example - * [A] 1-13,15; | [YA]US2015037680 (PARK JUN-HO [KR], et al) [Y] 14 * example - * [A] 1-13,15; | [XAYI]EP3118916 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,5-8,11-13 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0 43] , [0 51] - [0052]; example -; claim - * [A] 15 [Y] 14 [I] 2-4,9,10; | [A] - HU GUORONG ET AL, "Surface-fluorinated Li4Ti5O12nanowires/reduced graphene oxide composite as a high-rate anode material for Lithium ion batteries", APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, (20190130), vol. 479, doi:10.1016/J.APSUSC.2019.01.227, ISSN 0169-4332, pages 158 - 166, XP085663968 [A] 1-13 * Abstract; paragraph [02.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2019.01.227 |