EP4079193 - SHELVING BASE FOR A SHELVING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/43] | SHELVING UNIT AND SHELF, IN PARTICULAR WIRE GRID BASE FOR A SHELVING UNIT | ||
[2024/41] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - German title | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - English title | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - French title | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meta-Regalbau GmbH & Co. KG Eichenkamp 59759 Arnsberg / DE | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Otto, Ralph 16244 Schorfheide / DE | 02 /
Bergmann, Kay 58093 Hagen / DE | 03 /
Eremin, Dmitrij 59755 Arnsberg / DE | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Schäperklaus, Jochen, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 22166314.9 | 01.04.2022 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | DE202110110518 | 23.04.2021 Original published format: DE102021110518 | [2022/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079193 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/02, A47B55/02 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A47B96/021 (EP);
A47B55/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FACHBODEN FÜR EIN FACHBODENREGAL | [2024/41] | English: | SHELVING BASE FOR A SHELVING UNIT | [2024/41] | French: | TABLETTE POUR UNE ÉTAGÈRE À TABLETTE | [2024/41] |
Former [2022/43] | FACHBODEN, INSBESONDERE DRAHTGITTERFACHBODEN FÜR EIN FACHBODENREGAL UND FACHBODENREGAL | ||
Former [2022/43] | SHELVING UNIT AND SHELF, IN PARTICULAR WIRE GRID BASE FOR A SHELVING UNIT | ||
Former [2022/43] | TABLETTE, EN PARTICULIER ÉTAGÈRE GRILLAGÉE POUR UNE ÉTAGÈRE À TABLETTE ET ÉTAGÈRE À TABLETTE | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 08.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]BE692554 ; | [XAI]US4852501 (OLSON RALPH [US], et al); | [A]US2015359330 (OFFERMAN RYAN THOMAS [US]); | [XAI]EP3760078 (CERMAST IND [FR]) |