EP4252984 - GUIDE RAIL FOR A MOTORISED CHAIN SAW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andreas Stihl AG & Co. KG Badstrasse 115 71336 Waiblingen / DE | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Georg 71394 Kernen i.R. / DE | 02 /
Schulz, Matthias 71691 Freiberg/Neckar / DE | 03 /
Müller, Matthias 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Karzel, Philipp, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22166384.2 | 01.04.2022 | [2023/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4252984 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B27B17/02, // B27B17/04 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
B27B17/02 (EP);
B27B17/025 (EP);
B27B17/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSSCHIENE FÜR EINE MOTORKETTENSÄGE | [2023/40] | English: | GUIDE RAIL FOR A MOTORISED CHAIN SAW | [2023/40] | French: | RAIL DE GUIDAGE POUR UNE TRONÇONNEUSE À CHAÎNE | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4138813 (HARADA TATSUZO, et al) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 36 ** figure - *; | [XA]JPH0467002U (-) [X] 1,2,9,11,12,15,16 * figures 3,4 * [A] 3-8,10,13,14; | [XA]CN101708564 (HANGZHOU JINGFENG GARDEN TOOLS) [X] 1,4,5,8,11,12 * paragraph [0039] * * figures 1a-1d,2 * [A] 2,3,6,7,9,10,13-16; | [XA]CN201603916U (HANGZHOU JINGFENG GARDENS TOOLS CO LTD) [X] 1,4,5,8,11,12 * paragraph [0039] * * figures 1a-1d,2 * [A] 2,3,6,7,9,10,13-16 |