EP4086521 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Straße 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hölscher, Britta 30167 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Ennen, Volker 32257 Bünde / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 22166647.2 | 05.04.2022 | [2022/45] | Priority number, date | DE202110111581 | 05.05.2021 Original published format: DE102021111581 | BE20210005473 | 17.06.2021 Original published format: BE 202105473 | [2022/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4086521 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, A47J36/00 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
F24C7/082 (EP);
A47J36/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] |
Former [2022/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES HAUSHALTGERÄTESYSTEMS UND HAUSHALTGERÄTESYSTEM | [2022/45] | English: | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A DOMESTIC APPLIANCE SYSTEM | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME D'APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER ET SYSTÈME D'APPAREIL ÉLECTROMÉNAGER | [2022/45] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 09.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108006750 (NINGBO FOTILE KITCHEN WARE CO) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CN108451400 (ZHEJIANG SHAOXING SUPOR DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]JP2018194284 (RINNAI KK) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11-14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0036] * [A] 2,5,9,10; | [A]JP2019027635 (RINNAI KK) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP3668274 (EGO ELEKTRO GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]FR3098677 (GROUPE BRANDT [FR]) [AD] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR3098677 |