EP4072039 - RECONFIGURABLE FEED ARRAY FED CONFOCAL ANTENNA SYSTEM THAT CAN ADJUST THE RADIATION PATTERN BEAM SIZE AND THE GAIN PERFORMANCE ON-ORBIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIKIDO, Thomas Makoto El Segundo, 90245 / US | 02 /
CEELY, William Joseph El Segundo, 90245 / US | 03 /
WERNTZ, Paul Christian El Segundo, 90245 / US | 04 /
TURPIN, Raenaurd D. El Segundo, 90245 / US | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 22166691.0 | 05.04.2022 | [2022/41] | Priority number, date | US202163171906P | 07.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163171906 P | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4072039 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, H01Q1/28, H01Q19/19 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H04B7/18515 (EP);
H01Q1/50 (CN);
H01Q19/193 (US);
H01Q1/288 (EP,CN);
H01Q15/14 (CN);
H01Q19/19 (EP);
H01Q3/20 (US);
H01Q3/30 (CN);
H01Q3/16 (EP);
H04B7/2041 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] |
Former [2022/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKONFIGURIERBARES KONFOKALES ANTENNENSYSTEM MIT SPEISUNG DURCH EIN SPEISUNGSARRAY MIT FÄHIGKEIT ZUR EINSTELLUNG DER STRAHLGRÖSSE DES STRAHLUNGSMUSTERS UND DER VERSTÄRKUNGSLEISTUNG IN DER UMLAUFBAHN | [2022/41] | English: | RECONFIGURABLE FEED ARRAY FED CONFOCAL ANTENNA SYSTEM THAT CAN ADJUST THE RADIATION PATTERN BEAM SIZE AND THE GAIN PERFORMANCE ON-ORBIT | [2022/41] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ANTENNE CONFOCALE ALIMENTÉ PAR UN RÉSEAU D'ALIMENTATION RECONFIGURABLE QUI PEUT AJUSTER LA TAILLE DU FAISCEAU DU DIAGRAMME DE RAYONNEMENT ET LES PERFORMANCES DE GAIN EN ORBITE | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 10.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - MARTINEZ-LORENZO J A ET AL, "Zooming and Scanning Gregorian Confocal Dual Reflector Antennas", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE, USA, (20080901), vol. 56, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TAP.2008.928777, ISSN 0018-926X, pages 2910 - 2919, XP011234077 [X] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * abstract * * sections I-V * [I] 3,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.2008.928777 | [ ] - PINO A G ET AL, "Design and Analysis of an Adjustable Subreflector for the Hybrid Mechanical-Electronic Pointing System at the Satellite Q/V Band", ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM 2006, IEEE ALBUQUERQUE, NM, USA 09-14 JULY 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060709), ISBN 978-1-4244-0123-9, pages 2451 - 2454, XP010944386 [ ] * page 2451, line 7 - page 2453, line 6; figure 1 * |